Bisessar, Ahailya Sohini (CPSO#: 89060)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of The West Indies,Trinidad, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Carea CHC (Ajax)
360 Bayly Street, Unit 5
Ajax, ON
Ajax ON  L1S 1P1
Phone: 905-428-1212
Fax: 905-428-9151
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Carea CHC (Oshawa)
115 Grassmere Avenue
Oshawa, Ontario
Oshawa ON  L1H 3X7
Canada
Phone: 905-723-0036
Fax: 905-723-3391
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AHAILYA SOHINI BISESSAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BISESSAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2010