Bishara, Michael Wissam (CPSO#: 93222)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Allergy & Associates
1407 Ottawa St
Windsor
Ontario
Windsor ON  N8X 2G1
Phone: (519) 258-4356 Ext. 234
Fax: (519) 258-9918
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

KidCrew
1440 Bathurst St
Toronto
Ontario
Toronto ON  M5R 3J3
Canada
Phone: (416) 654-5437
Fax: (647) 689-2371
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Wissam Bishara Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bishara ( CPSO# 93222 )

Business Address:
Moy Medical Centre
1407 Ottawa Street
Windsor ON  N8X 2G1
Phone Number: (519) 258-4356

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL WISSAM BISHARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BISHARA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Oct 2016
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2014