Bishara, Phoebe Roshdy Youssif (CPSO#: 84860)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 19
450 Westheights Drive
Kitchener ON  N2N 2B9
Phone: (519) 579-6767
Fax: (519) 579-6763
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Doctors Office
3545 Kingston Rd
Toronto ON  M1M 1R6
Canada
Phone: 416-266-6600
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Phoebe Bishara Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Bishara ( CPSO# 84860 )

Business Address:
19 - 450 Westheights Drive
Kitchener ON  N2N 3B9
Phone Number: (519) 579-6767

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHOEBE ROSHDY YOUSSIF BISHARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BISHARA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 25 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2010