Bishnoi, Aseem (CPSO#: 94305)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 31 Jul 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 10 Aug 2010 to 09 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 10 Aug 2011 to 09 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 10 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 09 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 10 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 09 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 10 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2015