Bishop, Gregory Mark (CPSO#: 77670)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 743-2121
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Bishop and Jeyabalan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 08 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Jeyabalan ( CPSO# 76172 )
Dr. G. Bishop ( CPSO# 77670 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Corp.
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 772-1219

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 19 Sep 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY MARK BISHOP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BISHOP is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2006