Bisland, Stuart Kenward (CPSO#: 92793)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jul 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Hospital and Cancer
Centre
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: 9055212100 Ext. 64089
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 29 May 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STUART KENWARD BISLAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BISLAND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Jul 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2017