Biss, Tina Tracey (CPSO#: 85740)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Nottingham, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2006 to 18 Jan 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 19 Jan 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Aug 2007
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2007