Bissonnette, Lyle Vaughan (CPSO#: 73365)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 203
18 Pine Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 5Z8
Phone: (519) 585-1251
Fax: (519) 585-7906
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lyle Bissonnette, Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 26 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Bissonnette ( CPSO# 73365 )

Business Address:
203 - 18 Pine Street
Kitchener ON  N2H 5Z8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 05 Oct 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LYLE VAUGHAN BISSONNETTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BISSONNETTE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 31 May 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 May 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2002