Biswas, Robert Neal Krishna (CPSO#: 93432)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Geriatric Assessment Program
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
1453 Prince Road
Windsor ON  N9C 3Z4
Phone: 5192575112
Fax: 5192575242
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Biswas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Biswas ( CPSO# 93432 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Grace -Tayfour Campus
1453 Prince Road
Windsor ON  N9C 3Z4
Phone Number: (519) 257-5111

Business Address:
Strathroy General
395 Carrie Street
Strathroy ON  N7G 3T4
Phone Number: (519) 245-5295

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4411

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT NEAL KRISHNA BISWAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BISWAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014