Biyani, Mohan Brijlal (CPSO#: 75611)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2003

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Marathi

Education:Marathwada University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Nephrology
5th Floor
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone: (613) 738-8337 Ext. 82890
Fax: (613) 738-8337
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mohan B Biyani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 16 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Biyani ( CPSO# 75611 )

Business Address:
Division of Nephrology
Suite 5-30
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 738-8400

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 738-8400

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 738-8400

Business Address:
St. Vincent Hospital
60 Cambridge Street
Ottawa ON  K1R 7A5
Phone Number: (613) 562-6262

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site Ottawa
Cornwall General Hospital Cornwall
Hawkesbury & District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nephrology Effective: 01 Jul 2003 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 May 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 May 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Apr 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 30 Jun 2009

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2009 Active View Details [+]
                  Dr.   Mohan   Brijlal  Biyani  may  practise  medicine  independently  in
            Nephrology, only.