Biyong, Issack (CPSO#: 84047)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 08 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Universite De Yaounde I, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Issack Biyong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 9 2015

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Feb 2006 to 14 Mar 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 15 Mar 2006 to 14 Feb 2007
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Feb 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 May 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Jun 2014