Black, Steven Morton (CPSO#: 26154)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Sep 1973

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 29 Nov 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Malton Medical Centre
Suite 201
6870 Goreway Drive
Mississauga ON  L4V 1P1
Phone: (905) 677-4200 Ext. 224
Fax: (905) 677-0541
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Steven Morton Black Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 18 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Black ( CPSO# 26154 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
6870 Goreway Drive
Mississauga ON  L4V 1P1
Phone Number: (905) 677-4200

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Specified Certificate Effective: 10 May 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1973
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Nov 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 29 Nov 2010
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 21 Dec 2012
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 08 Nov 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 08 Nov 2018 Active View Details [+]
            (1 of 2)

            As  from  November  8,  2018, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate  of registration held by Dr. Steven Morton Black,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Black to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. STEVEN MORTON BLACK
                                          ("Dr. Black")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

            "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the
            Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended; 

            "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries,  Complaints  and  Reports Committee of the
            College;

            "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics  Monitoring  System
            implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;

            "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

            "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the public.

            (2)   I,  Dr.  Black, certificate of registration number 26154, am a member  of
                  the College. 

            (3)   I, Dr. Black,  acknowledge  that  the  College conducted an investigation
                  bearing File Number 7213821 (the "Investigation")  into whether I engaged
                  in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in  my  family practice.
                  The  Committee  directed  that  I  complete remediation and submit  to  a
                  reassessment  of my practice. The reassessment  report  received  by  the
                  College raised concerns about my standard of practice in family medicine. 

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Black, undertake  to  abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (5)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I,  Dr. Black, undertake  to  practise  under  the  guidance  of  a
                        clinical  supervisor  or  clinical  supervisors  acceptable  to the
                        College (the "Clinical Supervisor" or "Clinical Supervisors"),  for
                        three (3) months ("Clinical Supervision").
                  
                  (b)     I,  Dr.  Black,  acknowledge  that  I  have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor's  undertaking, attached hereto  as  Appendix  "A",  and
                        understand  what  is  required  of  the  Clinical  Supervisor.  The
                        Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate   the   education   program   set   out   in   the
                              Individualized  Education  Plan  ("IEP"),  attached hereto as
                              Appendix "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Review  the  materials provided by the College  and  have  an
                              initial   meeting    to    discuss    practice    improvement
                              recommendations;
                  
                        (iii) Meet  with  me  at  my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, once every month;
                  
                        (iv)  Review  at least ten (10)  of  my  patient  charts  at  every
                              meeting;
                  
                        (v)   Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (vi)  Make recommendations  to  me  for  practice  improvements and
                              ongoing   professional   development  and  inquire  into   my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (vii) Perform any other duties,  such  as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff  or  colleagues, that the
                              Clinical   Supervisor   deems   necessary   to  my   Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (viii)Submit  written  reports to the College at least  once  every
                              month, or more frequently  if  the  Clinical  Supervisor  has
                              concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I,  Dr.  Black,  acknowledge  that  the  charts  reviewed  shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor based on the educational  needs
                        identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", as well  as
                        the areas of concern identified in the report of the Assessor dated
                        February  2, 2018, and concerns that may arise during the period of
                        Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Black,  undertake  to  cooperate  fully  with  the  Clinical
                        Supervision  of  my  practice,  conducted  under  the  term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to  abide  by
                        the  recommendations  of  my Clinical Supervisor, including but not
                        limited  to,  any recommended  practice  improvements  and  ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I,  Dr. Black, undertake  to  ensure  that  Appendix  "A"  to  this
                        Undertaking  is  signed  and delivered to the College within twenty
                        (20) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I,  Dr.  Black,  undertake that  if  a  person  who  has  given  an
                        undertaking in Appendix  "A"  to  this  Undertaking  is  unable  or
                        unwilling  to  continue  to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving  notice  of  same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly  qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I,  Dr. Black, undertake that if I am unable to obtain  a  Clinical
                        Supervisor  on  the provisions set out under sections (5)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will  cease  practising  medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College. 

                  (h)   I, Dr. Black, acknowledge that if I am  required  to cease practise
                        as  a result of section (5)(g) above this will constitute  a  term,
                        condition  or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition  or  limitation  will  be  included  on  the Public
                        Register.
                  
            (6)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Black, undertake that, approximately three (3) months  after
                        the  completion  of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (5)
                        above and Appendix  "A"  to  this  Undertaking,  I will submit to a
                        reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by  an assessor or
                        assessors  selected by the College (the "Assessor" or "Assessors").
                        I acknowledge  that  the  Reassessment  may include a chart review,
                        direct  observation  of  my care, interviews  with  colleagues  and
                        co-workers, feedback from  patients  and  any  other  tools  deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I,  Dr. Black, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr.  Black,  acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor may receive
                        and review the findings  of  the Assessor, and may discuss with the
                        Assessor any issues or concerns arising from the Reassessment. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Black, acknowledge that the results of the Reassessment will
                        be provided to me and reported  to the College and the Reassessment
                        may form the basis of further action by the College.

            (7)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Black, undertake to inform  the  College  of  each and every
                        location  that  I practise or have privileges, including,  but  not
                        limited to, any hospitals,  clinics,  offices,  and any Independent
                        Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in  any  jurisdiction
                        (collectively  my  "Practice  Location"  or  "Practice Locations"),
                        within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward,
                        I  further  undertake  to  inform the College of any  and  all  new
                        Practice Locations within five  (5)  days of commencing practice at
                        that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Black, undertake that I will submit  to,  and  not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations  and patient
                        records  by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Black,  give  my  irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate  enquiries  of OHIP,  NMS  and/or  any  person  who  or
                        institution that may have  relevant  information,  in order for the
                        College  to  monitor  my  compliance  with the provisions  of  this
                        Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Black, acknowledge that I have executed  the  OHIP  and  NMS
                        consent  forms,  attached  hereto as Appendix "C" and Appendix "D",
                        respectively. 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (8)   I, Dr. Black, acknowledge that all  appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (9)   I,  Dr.  Black,  acknowledge  and  undertake   that  I  shall  be  solely
                  responsible  for  payment  of  all fees, costs, charges,  expenses,  etc.
                  arising  from  the implementation  of  any  of  the  provisions  of  this
                  Undertaking. 

            (10)  I, Dr. Black, acknowledge  that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this  Undertaking,  or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (11)  I, Dr. Black, acknowledge that the College will  provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar  responsibilities,  at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

            (12)  I,  Dr.  Black,  acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute  an  act  of  professional  misconduct  and/or
                  incompetence,  and  may result in a referral of specified allegations  to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (13)  I,  Dr.  Black, acknowledge  that  this  Undertaking  constitutes  terms,
                  conditions,  and  limitations  on  my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (14)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Black, acknowledge that,  during  the  time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking  shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I,  Dr.  Black,  acknowledge that, in addition to this  Undertaking
                        being  posted  in  accordance   with  section  (14)(a)  above,  the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              Following an investigation into whether Dr. Black had engaged
                              in professional misconduct  and/or  was  incompetent  in  his
                              family practice, Dr. Black submitted to a reassessment of his
                              practice.  The  reassessment  report  received by the College
                              raised  concerns  about  his  medical record  keeping.  As  a
                              result:
                  
                                    Dr.  Black  will  practise  under  the  guidance  of  a
                                    Clinical Supervisor acceptable  to  the  College  for 3
                                    months.
                  
                                    Dr.  Black's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                                    selected  by  the College within 3 months of the end of
                                    the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Black, acknowledge that  this  Undertaking remains in effect
                        until the College determines its terms are satisfied.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (15)  I, Dr. Black, give my irrevocable consent to  the  College to provide the
                  following information to all Clinical Supervisors and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation  into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my  compliance  with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (16)  I,  Dr.  Black, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chiefs of  Staff  with  any  information  the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (17)  I, Dr. Black, give my irrevocable consent to  all  Clinical  Supervisors,
                  Chiefs  of  Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College, and  to  one
                  another, any of the following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any  information   relevant  to  the  provisions  of  the  Clinical
                        Supervisor's  undertaking   set   out   at  Appendix  "A"  to  this
                        Undertaking;
                  
                  (c)   any information relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   any  information  relevant  for  the  purposes   of  monitoring  my
                        compliance with this Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   any  information  which  comes  to their attention and  which  they
                        reasonably  believe  indicates  a potential  risk  of  harm  to  my
                        patients.
                  
            (2 of 2)

            As from December 21, 2012, the following is imposed  as  a  term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Steven  Morton Black,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Black to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Black has relinquished his prescribing privileges with respect to the
                  following drugs, substances and preparations set out in the corresponding
                  regulations, as amended from time to time, and summarized as follows:
                  
                  
            Drug/Substance                      Relinquished

            Narcotic Drugs
            (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
             made under the Controlled Drugs
             and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)    X

            Narcotic Preparations
            (from the Narcotic Control Regulations
             made under the Controlled Drugs
             and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)    X

            Controlled Drugs
            (from Schedule G of the Regulations
             under the Food and Drugs
             Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27)                 X

            Benzodiazepines/Other Targeted Substances
            (from the Benzodiazepines and Other 
            Targeted Substances Regulations made 
            under the Controlled Drugs and 
            Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19)        X

            Monitored Drugs                            
            (from the Ministry of Health and Long-Term
             Care List of Monitored Drugs)             X




                  

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: November 8, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Steven Morton Black to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective November 8, 2018:

Following an investigation into whether Dr. Black had engaged in professional misconduct and/or was incompetent in his family practice, Dr. Black submitted to a reassessment of his practice. The reassessment report received by the College raised concerns about his medical record keeping. As a result:

• Dr. Black will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 3 months.

• Dr. Black’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 3 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.