Blackstein, Martin Elliot (CPSO#: 19948)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Martin E. Blackstein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 5 2008

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Medical records are stored at Mount Sinai and/or Princess Margaret Hospital located in Toronto, Ontario.
Date Received: 28 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Oct 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018