Blakeney, Jill Elaine (CPSO#: 59633)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: Rubinstein, Jill Elaine (used until: 18 Jun 1995 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Parkdale Community Health Centre 1229 Queen St W Toronto ON M6K 1L2 (416 - 534 - 2455) or Platnium Medical Clinic 3170 Eglinton Ave E Scarborough ON M1J 2H3 (416 - 265 - 2255)
Date Received: 16 May 2018

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018