Blanchette, Phillip Stanley (CPSO#: 90949)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Regional Cancer Centre
London Health Sciences Centre
790 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone: (519)-685-8640
Fax: (519)-685-8624
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Phillip Blanchette Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 21 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Blanchette ( CPSO# 90949 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
London Regional Cancer Centre
790 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone Number: (519) 685-8640

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHILLIP STANLEY BLANCHETTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLANCHETTE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2014