Bleakney, Robert Reginald (CPSO#: 76738)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Mar 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Mar 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
600 University Avenue 5th Floor
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 6199
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: White Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2017


Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Bleakney Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 08 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bleakney ( CPSO# 76738 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
600 University Avenue 5th Floor
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 09 May 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT REGINALD BLEAKNEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLEAKNEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 03 Apr 2003
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Apr 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2003
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Mar 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 2008