Blitz, Maurice (CPSO#: 90436)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 May 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 May 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
Sunnyside Wing
245 - 30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6182
Fax: (416) 530-6620
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Maurice Blitz Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 03 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Blitz ( CPSO# 90436 )

Business Address:
SSW 245
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6182

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Thoracic Surgery Effective: 23 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAURICE BLITZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLITZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 May 2009