Blonde, Kenneth Andrew (CPSO#: 95386)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Apr 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Apr 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Critical Care
Thunder Bay Regional Health Science
980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6000
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kenneth Blonde Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Blonde ( CPSO# 95386 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Department Of Critical Care
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENNETH ANDREW BLONDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLONDE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2016