Blue, Christopher Keith (CPSO#: 94354)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Apr 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Apr 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St. Matthew's University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1083 Ouellette Ave
3rd Floor
Windsor ON  N9A 4J8
Phone: (519) 915-7125
Fax: (519) 962-3339
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher Blue Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 04 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Blue ( CPSO# 94354 )

Business Address:
1083 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 4J8
Phone Number: (519) 915-7125

Business Address:
1100 Ouellette
Windsor ON  N9A 1C9
Phone Number: (519) 258-6722


Corporation Name: Dr. Peter Farago III Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 18 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Farago III ( CPSO# 96622 )
Dr. C. Blue ( CPSO# 94354 )

Business Address:
3019 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8W 1G8
Phone Number: (519) 258-4773

Business Address:
380 Pelissier Street
Windsor ON  N9A 6W8
Phone Number: (519) 962-0749

Business Address:
9917 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8R 1A5
Phone Number: (519) 258-4773

Business Address:
6525 Malden Road
Windsor ON  N9H 1T5
Phone Number: (519) 258-4773

Business Address:
433 Sandwich South
Amherstburg ON  N9V 3K8
Phone Number: (519) 258-4773

Business Address:
1083 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 4J8


Corporation Name: Dr. Jeffrey Nigl Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 22 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Nigl ( CPSO# 107868)
Dr. C. Blue ( CPSO# 94354 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4401

Business Address:
1083 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 4J8
Phone Number: (519) 915-7125

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER KEITH BLUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLUE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Sep 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Aug 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Nov 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Apr 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Apr 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2015