Bluhm, Melanie Dawn (CPSO#: 79063)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Nov 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
20 Shelldale Crescent
Guelph ON  N1H 1C8
Phone: (519) 821-6638 Ext. 2
Fax: (519) 780-2080
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

176 Wyndham Road
Guelph ON  N1H 8N9
Canada
Phone: (519) 821-6638 Ext. 1
Fax: (519) 821-5834
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

100 Westmount Road
Guelph ON  N1H 5H8
Canada
Phone: (519) 824-6000
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Homewood Health Centre Guelph
St Joseph's Health Centre,Guelph Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELANIE DAWN BLUHM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLUHM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2005