Blumenauer, Barbara Trudy (CPSO#: 74116)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 11 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2003