Blunt, Danielle Nicole (CPSO#: 92295)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Sep 2016

Expiry Date:  04 Jan 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 11 Oct 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The Flinders Univ of South Australia, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Haematology
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Australia

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIELLE NICOLE BLUNT shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. BLUNT is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. BLUNT shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BLUNT is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. BLUNT shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. BLUNT is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. BLUNT no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 04 Jan 2019.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 03 Dec 2009 to 16 Dec 2009
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 17 Dec 2009 to 29 Jan 2010
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2016 to 10 Oct 2016
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 11 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Aug 2017
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Aug 2018
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2018 to 04 Jan 2019
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jan 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Jan 2019