Boake, Armour Isaac (CPSO#: 74925)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 405
984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7C7
Phone: (807) 345-7879
Fax: (807) 345-5888
Electoral District: 09
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Thunder Bay Regional Health
Sciences Centre
Renal Services
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Canada
Phone: (807) 684-6158
Fax: (807) 684-5841
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Armour Boake Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 08 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Boake ( CPSO# 74925 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
Renal Unit
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6158

Business Address:
405 - 984 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7C7
Phone Number: (807) 345-7879

Business Address:
Riverside Health Care
Renal Unit
110 Victoria Avenue
Fort Frances ON  P9A 2B7
Phone Number: (807) 274-9317

Business Address:
Mene-Ya-Win Health Centre
Renal Unit
PO Box 909
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1B4
Phone Number: (805) 737-1509

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Geraldton District Hospital Geraldton
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital Red Lake
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 14 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARMOUR ISAAC BOAKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOAKE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2005