Boba, Lukasz Marek (CPSO#: 87813)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Nov 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Jagiellonian University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 209
5293 Highway 7 East
Markham ON  L3P 7M7
Phone: 289-301-6622
Fax: 289-301-6621
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 101
16700 Bayview Ave.
Newmarket ON  L3X 1W1
Canada
Phone: 905-953-0637
Fax: 905-953-0943
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Southlake Regional Health Centre,
596 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Canada
Phone: (905) 895-4521
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L. Boba Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 03 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Boba ( CPSO# 87813 )

Business Address:
101-16700 Bayview Avenue
Newmarket ON  L4G 0J9
Phone Number: (416) 357-7460

Business Address:
209-5293 Highway 7 East
Markham ON  L3P 7M7
Phone Number: (289) 301-6622

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 12 Oct 2011 CFPC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LUKASZ MAREK BOBA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOBA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2007 to 23 Jan 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Jan 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2008 to 31 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Nov 2009 to 31 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 07 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2013 to 30 Nov 2013
Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 16 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 17 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2010