Bock, Dirk Erich (CPSO#: 90228)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Feb 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 04 Feb 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:Johann Wolfgang Goethe Univ at Frankfurt, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Campus Site
Department of Paediatrics
P O Box 5010
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8824
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dirk Bock Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 17 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Bock ( CPSO# 90228 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Campus Site
Department of Paediatrics
800 Commissioners Road East, P.O. Box 5010
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 04 Feb 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Feb 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Feb 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Jan 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Dec 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Dirk Erich Bock may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Paediatrics, University of Western Ontario, in which Dr. Bock holds
                        an academic appointment at the rank of Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                        
            2.    The  certificate  of  registration automatically expires when Dr. Bock no
                  longer holds the apointment, referred to in clause 1.