Bodnar, Michael Larry (CPSO#: 86237)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Apr 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone: (705) 759-3434 Ext. 5420
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

443 Northern Avenue
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 4J3
Canada
Phone: (705) 759-2554 Ext. 2720
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08

3-658 Second Line West
West End Walk-in Clinic
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6C 2K9
Canada
Phone: (705) 450-2622
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Bodnar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bodnar ( CPSO# 86237 )

Business Address:
443 Northern Avenue
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 4J3
Phone Number: (705) 256-4403

Business Address:
Suite 3
658 Second Line West
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6C 2K9
Phone Number: (705) 450-2622

Business Address:
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL LARRY BODNAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BODNAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2010