Bohacek, Linda (CPSO#: 87695)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 10256 McEachern St Maple Ridge, BC V2W 0B2
Date Received: 29 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2007 to 09 Nov 2007
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Nov 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018