Bohra, Miqdad Hussain (CPSO#: 95280)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Feb 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Feb 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:R. N. T. Medical College, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Durham Community Clinic
Whitby Shores Plaza
Unit 116B
617 Victoria Street West
Whitby ON  L1N 0E4
Phone: (905) 668-2975 Ext. 221
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

International Sleep Clinic
West Parrysound Health Centre
6 Albert Street
Parry Sound ON  P2A 3A4
Canada
Phone: (705) 378-1162 Ext. 3306
County: Territorial District of Parry Sound
Electoral District: 08

Peterborough Community Clinic
CMHAHKPR
415 Water St. N.
Peterborough ON  K9H 3L9
Canada
Phone: (705) 748-6687 Ext. 1034
Fax: (705) 748-5649
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06

North Toronto Sleep Clinic,
4040 Finch Avenue
Toronto ON  M1S 4V5
Canada
Phone: (416) 293-3233
Fax: (416) 293-0692
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

611 Holly Ave
Suite 205
Milton ON  L9T 0K4
Canada
Phone: (905) 636-9772
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bohra Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 17 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bohra ( CPSO# 95280 )
Dr. C. Kaushik ( CPSO# 107784)

Business Address:
415 Water Street North
Peterborough ON  K9H 3L9
Phone Number: (705) 748-6687

Business Address:
116B - 617 Victoria Street West
Whitby ON  L1N 0E4
Phone Number: (905) 668-2975

Business Address:
205 - 611 Holly Avenue
Milton ON  L9T 0K4
Phone Number: (905) 636-9772

Business Address:
International Sleep Clinic
6 Albert Street
Parry Sound ON  P2A 3A4
Phone Number: (705) 378-1162

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
British Columbia
India
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ontario Shores Centre for Mental Health Sciences Whitby
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 02 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MIQDAD HUSSAIN BOHRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOHRA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2011 to 31 Jul 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 01 Mar 2013
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Oct 2014
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Jun 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Mar 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Feb 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 2014