Boisvenue, Marc (CPSO#: 91986)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rideau Rockcliffe Family Medicine
400 - 595 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L2
Phone: (613) 695-6900
Fax: (613) 695-6464
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Montfort Hospital 713 Montreal Rd
Ottawa ON  K1K0T2
Canada
Phone: 6137464621
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

RiversideHospital 1967 Riverside Dr
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Canada
Phone: (613) 798-5555
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Boisvenue Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 25 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Boisvenue ( CPSO# 91986 )

Business Address:
400-595 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L2
Phone Number: (613) 695-6900

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARC BOISVENUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOISVENUE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 24 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 25 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 04 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2012