Boivin Riveros, Marie Claire Marie (CPSO#: 93398)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Juan N. Corpas, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingsway Health Centre
First Floor Box 819
5542 Ann Street
Manotick ON  K4M 1A7
Phone: (613) 692-5433
Fax: (613) 692-5435
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIE CLAIRE MARIE BOIVIN RIVEROS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOIVIN RIVEROS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 27 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 28 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2012