Bokhari, Mahmoud Mohammedamin M (CPSO#: 94887)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Apr 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Nov 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Toronto
Suite 602
500 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Phone: (416) 978-6976
Fax: (416) 978-7144
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2065 Finch Ave West
Unit 212
Toronto ON  M3N 2V7
Canada
Phone: 647-477-6151
Fax: 866-692-6954
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 18 Oct 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAHMOUD MOHAMMEDAMIN M BOKHARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOKHARI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Apr 2011 to 30 May 2011
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 31 May 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2015