Bollegala, Natasha Pavithri (CPSO#: 90768)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jan 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Sinhalese

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Women's College Hospital
4th Floor
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone: (416) 323-7543
Fax: (416) 323-7549
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sunnybrook Health Sciences Center
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: (416) 323-7510
Fax: (416) 323-6360
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Kensington Screening Clinic
Suite 601, 340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Canada
Phone: (416) 323-7510
Fax: (416) 323-6360
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

York Diagnostic Centre
Endoscopy Clinic
Unit 4
3585 Keele Street
Toronto ON  M3J 3H5
Canada
Phone: (416) 398-2288
Fax: (416) 398-2588
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Mount Sinai Hospital
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Phone: (416) 323-7510
Fax: (416) 323-6360
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Natasha Bollegala Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 03 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Bollegala ( CPSO# 90768 )

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
4th Floor
3433-76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (647) 390-5970

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 323-7510

Business Address:
York Diagnostic Centre
Endoscopy Clinic
4-3585 Keele Street
Toronto ON  M3J 3H5
Phone Number: (416) 398-2288

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 323-7510

Business Address:
601-340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 323-7510

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 21 Nov 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATASHA PAVITHRI BOLLEGALA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOLLEGALA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 21 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 22 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2014