Bolster, Lauren Dawn (CPSO#: 89862)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 27 Jan 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Jan 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematology Effective: 12 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 22 Sep 2008 to 19 Oct 2008
Elective Trainee - Hematology

University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2012 to 27 Jan 2012
Elective Trainee - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jan 2012