Bombin, Victoria Elisa (CPSO#: 89259)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Mar 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Mar 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Victoria Bombin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 30 2014

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patient records stayed with the owner of the clinic, Mr. George Oduro, Pharmacist. Patients may write to the clinic address at Rymal Medical Clinic, 2247 Rymal Road, Stoney Creek, ON L8J 2V8. If unsuccessful, please contact the College of Pharmacists and/or the Information and Privacy Commissioners Office.
Date Received: 28 Aug 2015


Address: Rymal Medical Clinic 2247 Rymal Road Stoney Creek ON L8J 2V8 Attention: Record Request Dr. Bombin
Instructions: Please send requests to the address above.
Date Received: 10 Nov 2014

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Mar 2014