Bona, Mark David (CPSO#: 86238)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Department of Ophthalmology
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3400 Ext. 3388
Fax: (613) 544-3041
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bona and Klein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bona ( CPSO# 86238 )
Dr. A. Klein ( CPSO# 88687 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
Department of Opthamology
Room B2-029
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-3232

Business Address:
Queen's Family Health Team
220 Bagot Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3G2
Phone Number: (613) 533-9303

Business Address:
Queen's Wellness Services
146 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone Number: (613) 533-2506

Business Address:
Frontenac Medical Associates
791 Princess Street
Kingston ON  K7L 1E9
Phone Number: (613) 544-2727

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK DAVID BONA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BONA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012