Bonan, Raoul Isaac (CPSO#: 90026)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Paris, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Nov 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Feb 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Jan 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Feb 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Mar 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Apr 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jul 2015