Bond, Rebecca Mary (CPSO#: 73631)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Elgin Community Health Centre
153 Main Street
West Lorne ON  N0L 2P0
Phone: 519 768 1715
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rebecca Bond Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 5 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REBECCA MARY BOND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2001