Bondy, Lise Catherine (CPSO#: 91112)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jan 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jan 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Hospital
Room B3-412
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 646-6415
Fax: (519) 646-6040
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bondy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 25 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Bondy ( CPSO# 91112 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Hospital
Room B3-412
268 Grosvenor Road
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6207

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 30 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISE CATHERINE BONDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BONDY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2011 to 30 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Oct 2015
Clinical Fellow - Hepatology/Liver Transplantation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Jan 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2014