Bonneville, Kenneth Scott (CPSO#: 74701)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Apr 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anesthesia
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: 807-345-4626
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Scott Bonneville Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 10 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Bonneville ( CPSO# 74701 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anesthesia
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENNETH SCOTT BONNEVILLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BONNEVILLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 2003