Bonni, Azad (CPSO#: 57186)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Division of Neurology
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 3232
Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 26 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AZAD BONNI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BONNI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 1989
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Nov 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2011