Bonta, Mark John (CPSO#: 84792)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Medicine
200 Elizabeth Street
Room 14N 220
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 3155
Fax: (416) 595-5826
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark Bonta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bonta ( CPSO# 84792 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Medicine
Room 14N 206
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK JOHN BONTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BONTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010