Book, Ronald William (CPSO#: 61001)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Oct 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brantford General Hospital
Mental Health Services East Wing
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G7
Phone: (519) 751-5885
Fax: (519) 751-5898
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ronald Book Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 29 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Book ( CPSO# 61001 )

Business Address:
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RONALD WILLIAM BOOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOOK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 1991 to 28 Feb 1992
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 1990