Booth, Christopher Michael (CPSO#: 76617)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cancer Centre of Southeastern Ont
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 4501
Fax: (613) 546-8209
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher Michael Booth Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 22 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Booth ( CPSO# 76617 )

Business Address:
Cancer Centre of Southeastern Ontario
25 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 5P9
Phone Number: (613) 544-2631

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 13 Sep 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER MICHAEL BOOTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOOTH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2005