Boragina, Mariana Andrea (CPSO#: 83875)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Jan 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jan 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Buenos Aires, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 25 Mar 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
International Specialist Physician - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jan 2011