Borgono, Carla Andrea (CPSO#: 93371)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Dec 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church St
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: 1 905-472-7000
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Michael Garron Hospital
825 Coxwell Ave
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Canada
Phone: 1 416-461-8272
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 20 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CARLA ANDREA BORGONO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BORGONO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 26 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 27 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 20 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Nov 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Sep 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2015