Borkar-Aggarwal, Monica (CPSO#: 69989)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Marathi

Education:Queen's University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
iHealthCentre
Units 19- 22
6175 Highway 7
Vaughan ON  L4H 0P6
Phone: (905) 850-3091
Fax: (416) 840-8434
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

678 Main Street East, Suite 200
Hamilton, ON L8M 1K2
Hamilton ON  L8M 1K2
Canada
Phone: 905-544-4320
Fax: 905-544-4247
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Monica Borkar-Aggarwal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 05 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Borkar-Aggarwal ( CPSO# 69989 )

Business Address:
Unit 19-22
6175 Highway 7
Vaughan ON  L4H 0P6
Phone Number: (905) 850-3091

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MONICA BORKAR-AGGARWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BORKAR-AGGARWAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1998