Boroujerdi, Mehrnaz (CPSO#: 92305)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:Islamic Azad University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
East Toronto Health Centre
1496 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4J 1N4
Phone: (416) 778-1496
Fax: (416) 778-1400
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 12 May 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEHRNAZ BOROUJERDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOROUJERDI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 14 Dec 2009 to 18 Dec 2009
Elective Trainee - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2010 to 31 Aug 2011
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Nov 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Nov 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2015