Borowiec, Anna Marcjanna (CPSO#: 92091)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 21 Sep 2009 to 16 Oct 2009
Elective Trainee - Colorectal Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 7 - Colorectal Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Colorectal Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013