Borshch, Yurii Dmitrievich (CPSO#: 76873)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Apr 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Apr 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:The Kishinev State Medical Institute, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1642 Lockhill Selma Rd
San Antonio TX  78213
United States
Phone: (210) 233-9331
Fax: (210) 233-9454

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Texas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 03 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YURII DMITRIEVICH BORSHCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BORSHCH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2001
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Aug 2001
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 19 Aug 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 31 May 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Apr 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Apr 2008