Borth, Christopher Stephen (CPSO#: 73795)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:Queen's University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hippocratics Centre
751 King Street West
Suite 313
Kitchener ON  N2G 1E5
Phone: (519) 954-2370
Fax: (519) 954-8560
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Christopher Borth Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Borth ( CPSO# 73795 )

Business Address:
Suite 313
751 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1E5
Phone Number: (519) 954-2370

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER STEPHEN BORTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BORTH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004